EP1092385 - Sheathed probes for tissue type recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLARTECHNICS LTD Level 1, 140 William Street Sydney New South Wales 2011 / AU | [2007/41] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states POLARTECHNICS LTD Level 1, 140 William Street Sydney, New South Wales 2011 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skladnev, Victor N 1 Russell Street Vaucluse, New South Wales 2030 / AU | 02 /
Thompson, Richard L 5 Yeats Avenue Killarney Heights, New South Wales 2087 / AU | 03 /
Wunderman, Irwin 655 Eunice Avenue Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00127569.2 | 19.08.1997 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | US19970823660 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: US 823660 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1092385 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1092385 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092385 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
A61B5/0084 (EP,US);
A61B5/4331 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/16] | Title | German: | Umhüllung für Aufnehmer zur Wiedererkennung von Gewebetypen | [2001/16] | English: | Sheathed probes for tissue type recognition | [2001/16] | French: | Gaine pour capteur destiné à la reconnaissance de types de tissu | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 20.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2006 | 18.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97306308.4 / EP0865761 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Request for further processing for: | 29.03.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.04.2007 | Decision despatched | 23.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 28.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2006 | Decision despatched | 10.02.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.02.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2736623 (BRECHT HANS M DR, et al) [A] 5* the whole document *; | [A]EP0263466 (EMPI INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0598459 (OPTISCHE IND DE OUDE DELFT NV [NL]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9012617 | EP0650694 | by applicant | US5792053 | US5800350 | US5852494 |