EP1122684 - Radio-identification system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/04] |
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heuke, Dietmar Hoffmannstrasse 11 70825 Korntal / DE | 02 /
Heiser, Andre Spitalgartenstrasse 44 73257 Koengen / DE | [2001/32] | Application number, filing date | 00127659.1 | 18.12.2000 | [2001/32] | Priority number, date | DE2000104421 | 02.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10004421 | [2001/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1122684 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1122684 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | [2001/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1122684 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06K17/00, G06K7/08 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
G06K17/0022 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/32] | G06K17/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [2002/26] |
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Funk-Identifikationssystem und -verfahren | [2001/32] | English: | Radio-identification system and method | [2001/32] | French: | Système et procédé d'identification par ondes radio | [2001/32] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.01.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | [2009/39] |
Former [2008/46] | SE | 23.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1354947 (STIFTELSEN INST MIKROVAGS) [X] 1,4,6 * page 1 * * claims 1-4,11,12,14 * [A] 9; | [XA]US3772691 (HANSEN G) [X] 1 * claim 1 * [A] 9 | Examination | WO9948046 | by applicant | WO9514938 |