EP1110485 - A locking device for furniture in a row configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heinrich Brune GmbH & Co. Flurweg 15 53639 Königswinter / DE | [2001/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lepper, Christian Olgastrasse 6 34119 Kassel / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Roland Sophienstrasse 10 34117 Kassel / DE | 03 /
Sommerlade, Uwe Ulmenstrasse 16 34117 Kassel / DE | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Langmaack, Jürgen, et al Patentanwälte Maxton & Langmaack Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Langmaack, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Maxton &Langmaack Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00127672.4 | 18.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | DE1999222635U | 23.12.1999 Original published format: DE 29922635 U | [2001/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1110485 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1110485 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/124, A47B87/00 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
A47C1/124 (EP);
A47B87/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/29] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | ||
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum gegenseitigen Verriegeln von gruppierbaren Möbeln | [2001/26] | English: | A locking device for furniture in a row configuration | [2001/26] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage pour meubles en rangée | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 08.05.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.07.2002 | FR | 17.07.2002 | GB | 17.07.2002 | GR | 17.07.2002 | IE | 17.07.2002 | IT | 17.07.2002 | NL | 17.07.2002 | TR | 17.07.2002 | DK | 17.10.2002 | PT | 17.10.2002 | SE | 17.10.2002 | AT | 18.12.2002 | LU | 18.12.2002 | BE | 31.12.2002 | CY | 31.12.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/51] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
FR | 17.07.2002 | ||
GB | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
IE | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
TR | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
AT | 18.12.2002 | ||
LU | 18.12.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/51] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
FR | 17.07.2002 | ||
GB | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
IE | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
AT | 18.12.2002 | ||
LU | 18.12.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GB | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
IE | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
AT | 18.12.2002 | ||
LU | 18.12.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GB | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
IE | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
AT | 18.12.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GB | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
IE | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
BE | 31.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GB | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
IE | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/45] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GB | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
IE | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
DK | 17.10.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GB | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
IE | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GB | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
PT | 17.10.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GB | 17.07.2002 | ||
GR | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
GB | 17.07.2002 | ||
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 17.07.2002 | |
NL | 17.07.2002 | ||
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/07] | NL | 17.07.2002 | |
SE | 17.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 17.10.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH298091 (SOC D FORGES DU CREUX [CH]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3915100 (SULLIVAN HENRY E); | [A]DE3835714 (KUSCH CO SITZMOEBEL [DE]); | [A]DE19701534 (SOUTHCO [US]); | [A]DE19642392 (THONET GEB GMBH [DE]) |