EP1113027 - Olefin copolymer having functional group, production process thereof and rubber composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | ||
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states JSR Corporation 2-11-24, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshima, Noboru JSR Corporation, 11-24, Tsukiji 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | 02 /
Maruyama, Youichirou JSR Corporation, 11-24, Tsukiji 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | 03 /
Sawada, Katsutoshi JSR Corporation, 11-24, Tsukiji 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | 04 /
Tsuji, Syouei JSR Corporation, 11-24, Tsukiji 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00128085.8 | 21.12.2000 | [2001/27] | Priority number, date | JP19990371731 | 27.12.1999 Original published format: JP 37173199 | [2001/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1113027 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1113027 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/00, C08F232/08, C08F210/16, C08F210/18, C08L23/16 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
C08F210/02 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F210/18 (EP,US);
C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/02, C08F4/68 (EP,US);
C08L23/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/06, C08F232/08, C08F2500/25, C08F2500/21, C08F2500/17 (US,EP);
C08F210/18, C08F210/06, C08F232/08, C08F236/20, C08F2500/17 (US,EP);
C08F210/18, C08F210/06, C08F232/08, C08F2500/25, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/21 (EP,US);
C08F210/18, C08F232/08, C08F236/20, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/21, C08F2500/25 (EP,US) (-) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/19] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Olefin copolymer mit funktioneller Gruppe, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Kautschuk Zusammensetzung | [2001/27] | English: | Olefin copolymer having functional group, production process thereof and rubber composition | [2001/27] | French: | Copolymère oléfine avec groupe fonctionelle, procédé de préparation et composition de coutchouc | [2001/27] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 28.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01240517 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]JPH10330429 (JSR CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0816387 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0694567 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-6,10-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0694568 (HOECHST AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-6,10-13 * the whole document * |