EP1114601 - Merchandising display comprising a pivotable shutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LI | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde Kältetechnik GmbH & Co.KG Sürther Hauptstrasse 173 50999 Köln / DE | [2004/41] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Linde Kältetechnik GmbH & Co.KG Sürther Hauptstr.173 50999 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oepen von, Erhard Steinhauser Bergstrasse 5a 58332 Schwelm / DE | 02 /
Link, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Distelweg 2 65527 Niedernhausen / DE | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/22] | Zahn, Christoph, et al Linde Aktiengesellschaft, Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 00128163.3 | 21.12.2000 | [2001/28] | Priority number, date | DE20002000012U | 03.01.2000 Original published format: DE 20000012 U | [2001/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1114601 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1114601 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1114601 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47F3/00, A47F3/04 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
A47F3/004 (EP);
A47F3/0469 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/28] | A47F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Warenpräsentationsmöbel mit einer schwenkbaren Blende | [2001/28] | English: | Merchandising display comprising a pivotable shutter | [2001/28] | French: | Meuble de présentation pour des articles avec un cache basculant | [2001/28] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 15.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.10.2004 | FI | 06.10.2004 | FR | 06.10.2004 | GB | 06.10.2004 | IE | 06.10.2004 | IT | 06.10.2004 | SE | 06.10.2004 | TR | 06.10.2004 | LU | 21.12.2004 | BE | 31.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | GR | 06.01.2005 | ES | 17.01.2005 | PT | 06.03.2005 | [2012/49] |
Former [2008/03] | CY | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
FR | 06.10.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
IT | 06.10.2004 | ||
SE | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
LU | 21.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
PT | 06.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/35] | CY | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
FR | 06.10.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
IT | 06.10.2004 | ||
SE | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
LU | 21.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CY | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
FR | 06.10.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
SE | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
LU | 21.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CY | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
FR | 06.10.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
LU | 21.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
FR | 06.10.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
FR | 06.10.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 06.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0089556 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0441357 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1029476 (REMIS [DE]) [PA] 1-5* the whole document * |