EP1116698 - Antibacterial property imparting glass composition, antibacterial fiber, antibacterialtwisted yarn and antibacterial cloth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISHIZUKA GARASU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-15, Takatsuji-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states ISHIZUKA GARASU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-15, Takatsuji-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nomura, Makio, c/0 Ishizuka Garasu K.K. 11-15,Takatsuji-cho, Showa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00128264.9 | 22.12.2000 | [2001/29] | Priority number, date | JP19990375579 | 28.12.1999 Original published format: JP 37557999 | JP20000292964 | 26.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000292964 | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1116698 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1116698 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/064, C03C3/066, C03C3/17, C03C3/19, C03C4/00, C03C12/00, A01N59/16 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
C03C12/00 (EP,US);
A01N59/16 (EP,US);
C03C3/17 (EP,US);
C03C3/19 (EP,US);
C03C4/00 (EP,US);
D01F1/103 (EP);
C03C2204/02 (EP,US);
Y10S428/907 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2915 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2916 (EP,US);
Y10T428/292 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2938 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2525 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3976 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N59/16, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/16, A01N25/34 (US,EP);
A01N59/16, A01N59/26, A01N59/16, A01N59/14, A01N59/06, A01N25/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/15] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Antibakterielle Eigenschaften verleihende Glaszusammensetzung, antibakterielle Faser, antibakterieller Zwirn und antibakterieller Stoff | [2004/37] | English: | Antibacterial property imparting glass composition, antibacterial fiber, antibacterialtwisted yarn and antibacterial cloth | [2001/29] | French: | Composition de verre conférant une propriété antibacterienne, fibre antibacterienne, fibre tressée antibacterienne et toile antibacterienne | [2001/29] |
Former [2001/29] | Antiseptische Eigenschaften verleihende Glaszusammensetzung, antiseptische Faser, antiseptischer Zwirn und antiseptischer Stoff | Examination procedure | 22.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2004 | CY | 15.09.2004 | ES | 15.09.2004 | FI | 15.09.2004 | IT | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | TR | 15.09.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | SE | 15.12.2004 | GB | 22.12.2004 | IE | 22.12.2004 | LU | 22.12.2004 | BE | 31.12.2004 | CH | 31.12.2004 | FR | 31.12.2004 | LI | 31.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/03] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
CY | 15.09.2004 | ||
ES | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IT | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
LU | 22.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
CH | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
PT | 15.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
CY | 15.09.2004 | ||
ES | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IT | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
LU | 22.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
CH | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
CY | 15.09.2004 | ||
ES | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
LU | 22.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
CH | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
CH | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
CH | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
GB | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 22.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07300339 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-11* Comparative example 7 * |