EP1168430 - Semiconductor device and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Takuji c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Iwamatsu, Toshiaki c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
Hirano, Yuuichi c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25 d 81545 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/01] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00128270.6 | 22.12.2000 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | JP20000171818 | 08.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000171818 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1168430 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1168430 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/762, H01L21/84, H01L21/314 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H01L21/76264 (EP,US);
H01L21/76 (KR);
H01L21/84 (EP,US);
H01L21/02126 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02129 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02164 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0217 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/022 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02271 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02274 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/3143 (US);
H01L21/3185 (US);
H01L21/76283 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/38] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement und Herstellungsverfahren | [2002/01] | English: | Semiconductor device and method of manufacturing the same | [2002/01] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur et méthode de fabrication | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.03.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 31.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.11.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.12.2005 | [2007/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH06244180 ; | [A]WO9718585 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1,7* abstract *; | [A]US5767549 (CHEN WEI [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US5899712 (CHOI KI SIK [KR], et al) [A] 1,2,7,8,10 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9933115 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941129), vol. 018, no. 626, Database accession no. (E - 1636), & JP06244180 A 19940902 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * |