EP1113150 - Valve operating system for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/27] | Valve operating system in internal combustion engine | ||
[2004/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Chikara, c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Noriyuki, c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Iwamoto, Junichi, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha PSG 143 Hagadai, Haga-machi Haga-gun, Tochigi / JP | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00128354.8 | 22.12.2000 | [2001/27] | Priority number, date | JP19990370833 | 27.12.1999 Original published format: JP 37083399 | [2001/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1113150 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1113150 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1113150 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/26, F01L13/00, F01L1/18 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
F01L1/26 (EP,US);
F01L1/18 (EP,US);
F01L1/267 (EP,US);
F01L2305/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/27] | F01L1/26, F01L13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/17] |
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ventilsteuerungseinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine | [2004/10] | English: | Valve operating system for an internal combustion engine | [2004/10] | French: | Commande de soupapes pour moteur à combustion interne | [2004/10] |
Former [2001/27] | Ventilsteuerungseinrichtung in einer Brennkraftmaschine | ||
Former [2001/27] | Valve operating system in internal combustion engine | ||
Former [2001/27] | Commande de soupapes de moteur à combustion interne | Examination procedure | 18.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4809663 (DE TOMASO ALEJANDRO [IT]) [A] 1,4,6 * the whole document *; | [X]US4844023 (KONNO TSUNEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 5, line 19 - column 5, line 32; figures 1,4,7,8 * * column 5, line 61 - column 5, line 64 *; | [X]EP0420159 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 4, line 5 - column 4, line 21; figures 1-3 *; | [X]JPH1018823 (OTIX KK) [X] 1,4-6 * figures 1,8,19 *; | [A]DE19701203 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1* column 2, line 48 - column 2, line 61; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | JPH06185322 |