EP1116655 - Air mass flow control system with pressure altitude correction for a passenger aircrat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2005/36] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states EADS Airbus GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buchholz, Uwe Albert, Dipl.-Ing. Auf der Worth 17 21640 Bliedersdorf / DE | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00128465.2 | 23.12.2000 | [2001/29] | Priority number, date | DE2000100669 | 11.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10000669 | [2001/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1116655 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1116655 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1116655 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B64D13/02 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
B64D13/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/29] | Title | German: | Luftmassenstromregelsystem mit Druckhöhenkorrektur für ein Verkehrsflugzeug | [2001/29] | English: | Air mass flow control system with pressure altitude correction for a passenger aircrat | [2001/29] | French: | Système de contrôle d'un courant de masse d'air avec correction pour l'altitude barométrique pour un avion de transport | [2001/29] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 04.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 07.09.2005 | IE | 07.09.2005 | NL | 07.09.2005 | TR | 07.09.2005 | DK | 07.12.2005 | GR | 07.12.2005 | AT | 23.12.2005 | CY | 23.12.2005 | BE | 31.12.2005 | CH | 31.12.2005 | LI | 31.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | PT | 07.02.2006 | [2007/28] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
CY | 23.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 07.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5273486 (EMMONS F RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]DE4316886 (NORD MICRO ELEKTRONIK FEINMECH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19707858 (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AIRBUS [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |