EP1116515 - Encapsulated liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier-Genève / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ubbink, Johan, Bernhard In der Ey 11 8047 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Quellet, Christian Sesslerstrasse 2 2502 Biel / CH | 03 /
Taschi, Marc Gotthardstrasse 8b 5607 Hägglingen / CH | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | McStea, John Anthony, et al Global Patents Givaudan Schweiz AG Ueberlandstrasse 138 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2005/35] |
Former [2001/29] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00128675.6 | 29.12.2000 | [2001/29] | Priority number, date | EP20000100464 | 11.01.2000 Original published format: EP 00100464 | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1116515 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1116515 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/02, A61K9/50, A61K7/46, C11D3/50, A23L1/22, A23L2/56 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
A61Q13/00 (EP);
A23L2/56 (EP);
A23L27/72 (EP);
A61K8/064 (EP);
B01J13/02 (EP);
C11D17/0017 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2001/29] | B01J13/02, A61K9/50, A61K7/46, C11D3/50, A23L1/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/29] | Title | German: | Eingekapselte Flüssigkeit | [2001/29] | English: | Encapsulated liquid | [2001/29] | French: | Liquide encapsulé | [2001/29] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 25.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/11] | 13.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US5183690 (CARR MERLE E [US], et al) [DY] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 39 - line 43; example 52 *; | [Y]EP0815743 (KRAFT FOODS INC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0480729 (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4389419 (LIM FRANKLIN, et al) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9818610 (LENGERICH BERNHARD H VAN [US]) [DA] 1-8 * abstract *; | [DA]US4232047 (SAIR LOUIS, et al) [DA] 1-8 * abstract *; | [AD]WO8504074 (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US3971852 (BRENNER JOSEPH, et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US5518736 (MAGDASSI SHLOMO [IL], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5087461 (LEVINE HARRY [US], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]DE4002257 (TOMKA IVAN [CH]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4083798 (VERSTEEG JOSEPH) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5498439 (BONNER MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |