EP1124393 - Cellular communication system and method of structuring control channel transmissions therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2011 | Deletion: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | 20.01.2011 | Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Limited Jays Close, Viables Industrial Estate Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states Motorola Limited Jays Close, Viables Industrial Estate Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4PD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourque, Francis / FR | 02 /
Prost, Jean-Baptiste 17, rue Comby Toulouse 31500 / FR | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Kopacz, William James, et al Law Offices Kopacz 129 Boulevard Saint-Germain 75006 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Kopacz, William James, et al Law Offices Kopacz 129 Boulevard Saint-Germain 75006 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/33] | Kopacz, William James, et al William J. Kopacz & Associates, 83 Avenue Foch 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00200420.8 | 08.02.2000 | [2001/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1124393 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/19] |
Former [2001/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zellulares Kommunikationssystem und Verfahren zur Strukturierung von Steuerkanalaussendungen dafür | [2001/33] | English: | Cellular communication system and method of structuring control channel transmissions therein | [2001/33] | French: | Système de communication cellulaire et méthode pour structurer les transmissions du canal d'organisation correspondantes | [2001/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); General Packet Radio Service (GPRS); Overall description of the GPRS radio interface; Stage 2; (GSM 03.64 version 7.0.0 Release 1998)", EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATION STANDARD, (199907), pages 1 - 42, XP002136580 [A] 1-3,8-10,13-15 * page 15, line 14 - line 37 * * page 27, line 1 - line 27 * * page 28, line 27 - page 29, line 13 * | [A] - OLOFSSON H ET AL, "Aspects of Introducing EDGE in Existing GSM Networks", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UNIVERSAL PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE, NEW YORK, NY, (19981005), pages 421 - 426-426, XP002104616 [A] 1,7,8,13 * page 423, right-hand column, line 37 - page 424, left-hand column, line 49 * | [A] - BALACHANDRAN K ET AL, "GPRS-136: HIGH-RATE PACKET DATA SERVICE FOR NORTH AMERICAN TDMA DIGITAL CELLULAR SYSTEMS", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, (199906), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 1070-9916, pages 34 - 47, XP000831519 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/98.772976 |