Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9926678 | Global Dossier | 03.06.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97916097 | 26.11.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9841087 | Global Dossier | 24.09.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81910697 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10507395 | Global Dossier | 21.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9607717 | 22.05.1996 | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4340927B | Global Dossier | 07.10.2009 | B2 | JP2002522007 | 16.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9803712 | 25.02.1998 | US81910697 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001523530 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US97916097 | 26.11.1997 | US9824010 | 11.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1058563 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2005 | B1 | EP1058563 | 20.03.2002 | A4 | EP1058563 | 13.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97916097 | 26.11.1997 | US9824010 | 11.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0909128 | Global Dossier | 21.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9803712 | 25.02.1998 | US81910697 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0784496 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2003 | B1 | EP0784496 | 26.07.2000 | A4 | EP0784496 | 23.07.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9607717 | 22.05.1996 | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5932896 | Global Dossier | 05.03.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9607717 | 22.05.1996 | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0997158 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2004 | B1 | EP0997158 | 31.05.2000 | A3 | EP0997158 | 03.05.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | EP96916645 | 22.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE248011T | 15.09.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9607717 | 22.05.1996 | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2198696 | 16.05.2006 | C | CA2198696 | 20.02.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9607717 | 22.05.1996 | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2255121 | 24.09.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9803712 | 25.02.1998 | US81910697 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69629657T | 09.06.2004 | T2 | DE69629657D1 | 02.10.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9607717 | 22.05.1996 | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69828825T | 29.12.2005 | T2 | DE69828825D1 | 03.03.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US97916097 | 26.11.1997 | US9824010 | 11.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO971602L | 05.06.1997 | L | NO971602D0 | 08.04.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US9607717 | 22.05.1996 | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6080322 | 27.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US7296198 | 05.05.1998 | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6251284 | 26.06.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | US97916097 | 26.11.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6527957 | 04.03.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US7296198 | 05.05.1998 | US28767199 | 07.04.1999 | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | US81910697 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9705938 | Global Dossier | 20.02.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE282442T | 15.12.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69633876T | 03.11.2005 | T2 | DE69633876D1 | 23.12.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5762791 | 09.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US51280795 | 09.08.1995 | Type | Earlier application | EP0784496 |