EP0997158 - Systems and methods for separating erythrocytes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deniega, Jose 22245 Anthony Drive Lake Forest, California 92630 / US | 02 /
Duff, Daniel 17 Heron Irvine California 92714 / US | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00200426.5 | 22.05.1996 | [2000/18] | Priority number, date | US19950512807 | 09.08.1995 Original published format: US 512807 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0997158 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0997158 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0997158 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/34, A61M1/30 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
A61M1/30 (EP,US);
A61M1/265 (EP,US);
A61M1/303 (EP,US);
A61M1/306 (EP,US);
A61M1/308 (EP,US);
A61M1/309 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/18] | A61M1/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/18] | Title | German: | Systeme und Methoden zur Trennung von Erythrocyten | [2000/18] | English: | Systems and methods for separating erythrocytes | [2000/18] | French: | Systèmes et méthodes de séparation des érythrocytes | [2000/18] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 13.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96916645.3 / EP0784496 | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.11.2004 | BE | 17.11.2004 | CH | 17.11.2004 | LI | 17.11.2004 | NL | 17.11.2004 | DK | 17.02.2005 | SE | 17.02.2005 | ES | 28.02.2005 | [2007/09] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 17.11.2004 | |
BE | 17.11.2004 | ||
CH | 17.11.2004 | ||
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
NL | 17.11.2004 | ||
DK | 17.02.2005 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 17.11.2004 | |
BE | 17.11.2004 | ||
CH | 17.11.2004 | ||
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
DK | 17.02.2005 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 17.11.2004 | |
CH | 17.11.2004 | ||
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
DK | 17.02.2005 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 17.11.2004 | |
CH | 17.11.2004 | ||
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 17.11.2004 | |
LI | 17.11.2004 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 17.11.2004 | |
LI | 17.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4267269 (GRODE GERALD A, et al) [AD] 1,3 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 8 *; | [A]EP0243744 (MILES LAB [US]) [A] 1,6 * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 32; figure 1 *; | [YD]EP0303765 (MCLAUGHLIN WILLIAM F [US]) [YD] 5,7,8 * page 6, line 27 - page 9, line 52; figure - *; | [XY]EP0349188 (ASAHI MEDICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 4, line 13 - page 8, line 40 * * page 9, line 49 - page 11, line 7; figure - * [Y] 5,7,8; | [X]WO9220429 (BAXTER INT [US]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 7, line 22 - page 9, line 8; figures 1-3 * * page 10, line 29 - page 12, line 28 *; | [AD] - HEATON, A. ET AL., "Use of Adsol preservation solution for prolonged storage of low viscosity as - 1 red blood cells", BR J HAEMATOLOGY, (1984), vol. 57, pages 467 - 478, XP002134810 [AD] 2 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2141.1984.tb02921.x |