EP1052539 - Method of forming a discontinuous polymer overcoat for imaging elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lobo, Rukmini B. Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Fitzgerald, Barry Anthony Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Lobo, Lloyd Anthony Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Nair, Mridula Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/46] | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle B.P. 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00201593.1 | 03.05.2000 | [2000/46] | Priority number, date | US19990313555 | 14.05.1999 Original published format: US 313555 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052539 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/74, B41M3/00 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
G03C1/74 (EP,US);
B41M3/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/31] |
Former [2000/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer diskontinuierlichen polymerischen Schutzschicht für Bilderzeugungselemente | [2000/46] | English: | Method of forming a discontinuous polymer overcoat for imaging elements | [2000/46] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d' une couche protectrice polymérique discontinue pour éléments formant image | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/48] | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4113903 (CHOINSKI EDWARD J) [Y] 5,6,10 * column 1, line 8 - line 17 ** column 2, line 23 - line 25; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0414015 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [Y] 2,3,8,9 * column 5, line 3 - line 18 * * column 7, line 11 - line 25 * * column 8, line 37 - column 9, line 17 * * column 10, line 41 - line 47; figure 1 *; | [XY]US5368894 (LAMMERS TED J [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 9 - line 40 * * column 4, line 3 - line 49 * * column 5, line 23 - line 28 * * column 12, line 22 - line 39 * [Y] 2-6,8-10; | [Y]WO9526270 (REXHAM IND CORP [US], et al) [Y] 4,8,9 * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 1 * * page 4, line 17 - line 32 * * page 8, line 25 - line 27; figures 2,3 * |