EP1053896 - Device for taking corners with a four wheel motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arscone Luigi Via Sturla 22A/9 16131 Genova / IT | [2000/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/47] | Application number, filing date | 00201747.3 | 15.05.2000 | [2000/47] | Priority number, date | IT1999GE00052 | 17.05.1999 Original published format: IT GE990052 | [2000/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053896 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/015, B60G21/10, B60G21/073 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
B60G21/073 (EP);
B60G17/0162 (EP);
B60G17/0185 (EP);
B60G21/106 (EP);
B60G2202/32 (EP);
B60G2202/413 (EP);
B60G2400/104 (EP);
B60G2400/204 (EP);
B60G2400/412 (EP);
B60G2400/61 (EP);
B60G2500/322 (EP);
B60G2600/044 (EP);
B60G2600/182 (EP);
B60G2800/0122 (EP);
B60G2800/24 (EP);
B60G2800/9122 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für Kurve-Bewegung mit einem vierrädigem Kraftfahrzeug | [2000/47] | English: | Device for taking corners with a four wheel motor vehicle | [2000/47] | French: | Dispositif pour virer avec une voiture automobil, à quatre roues | [2000/47] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/25] | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.07.2001 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | 11.07.2001 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.07.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   06.08.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63137008 ; | [A]JPH02141318 ; | [A]US2960349 (VOGEL ARTHUR E) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US3065976 (VOGEL ARTHUR E) [A] * figure - *; | [A]US5291406 (WILLIAMS DAVID A [GB], et al); | [A]WO9830405 (VON AUER ANATOL [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881013), vol. 012, no. 384, Database accession no. (M - 753), & JP63137008 A 19880609 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900816), vol. 014, no. 379, Database accession no. (M - 1012), & JP02141318 A 19900530 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [A] * abstract * |