EP1053765 - Safety device for occupants of a road vehicle for the supply of oxygen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/47] | Safety device for occupants of a road or water vehicle for the supply of oxygen | ||
[2004/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states van de Wiel, Johannes Arnoldus Hoge Rijndijk 88/F 2313 KL Leiden / NL | [2005/10] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states van de Wiel, Johannes Arnoldus Herensingel 40 2315 LZ Leiden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | van Assen, Jan Willem Bernard Verbeekstraat 8 2332 CA Leiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Van Assen, Jan Willem Bernard Verbeekstraat 8 2332 CA Leiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 00201753.1 | 16.05.2000 | [2000/47] | Priority number, date | NL19991012116 | 21.05.1999 Original published format: NL 1012116 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053765 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1053765 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A62B33/00, A62B7/02 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
A62B7/02 (EP);
A62B33/00 (EP);
B63C9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/47] | Title | German: | Sicherheitseinrichtung zur Zuführung von Sauerstoff für Insassen von Strassenzeugen | [2004/03] | English: | Safety device for occupants of a road vehicle for the supply of oxygen | [2004/03] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité pour l'alimentation d'oxygène pour les passagers d'un véhicule routier | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/47] | Sicherheitseinrichtung zur Zuführung von Sauerstoff für Insassen von Strassen- oder Wasserkraftfahrzeugen | ||
Former [2000/47] | Safety device for occupants of a road or water vehicle for the supply of oxygen | ||
Former [2000/47] | Dispositif de sécurité pour l'alimentation d'oxygène pour les passagers d'un véhicule routier ou marin | Examination procedure | 22.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 11.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2004 | CH | 22.09.2004 | ES | 22.09.2004 | FI | 22.09.2004 | IT | 22.09.2004 | LI | 22.09.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | SE | 22.12.2004 | PT | 22.02.2005 | CY | 16.05.2005 | IE | 16.05.2005 | LU | 16.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
ES | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
IT | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CY | 16.05.2005 | ||
IE | 16.05.2005 | ||
LU | 16.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
ES | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CY | 16.05.2005 | ||
IE | 16.05.2005 | ||
LU | 16.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
ES | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CY | 16.05.2005 | ||
IE | 16.05.2005 | ||
LU | 16.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
ES | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
CY | 16.05.2005 | ||
IE | 16.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
ES | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 16.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
IE | 16.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 22.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1214998 (KIDDE WALTER CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US3016061 (MADDOCK ROBERT W) [A] 1-7 * column W *; | [A]US4909247 (TERRISSE PATRICK R [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column W *; | [A]US5132663 (STROBL WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 2 * column W *; | [A]US5162006 (YANDLE II SYLVESTER E [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 58; figure - *; | [A]US5301665 (JUMPERTZ WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1-7* column W *; | [A]EP0864455 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 15; figure - * | by applicant | NL8800905 | US4905684 |