EP1058219 - Two step programming method of remote controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP Parallelweg 2 7141 DC Groenlo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP Parallelweg 2 NL-7141 DE Groenlo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kip, Harm Jakob Lariksstraat 4 7132 CS Lichtenvoorde / NL | 02 /
Steentjes, Hendrikus Bernardus Maria Koepeloven 27 7011 VJ Gaanderen / NL | [2000/49] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00201938.8 | 31.05.2000 | [2000/49] | Priority number, date | NL19991012203 | 01.06.1999 Original published format: NL 1012203 | [2000/49] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058219 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G08C19/28 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
G08C19/28 (EP,US);
H05B47/195 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/34] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zwei-Stufen-Verfahren zur Programmierung von Fernsteuereinrichtung | [2000/49] | English: | Two step programming method of remote controller | [2000/49] | French: | Méthode de programmation de télécommande en deux étapes | [2000/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 07.06.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 16.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9406106 (SEIKI OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,2,9-11 * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 1 * * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 34 *; | [A]US5629868 (TESSIER ALAIN [CA], et al) [A] 1-6,8,11,13 * column 5, line 26 - line 57 * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 9 *; | [A]DE19605132 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,2,8* column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 51 *; | [XA] - "DEVICE SELECTION INDICATOR WITH REMOTE CONTROL", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19930401), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 269 - 270, XP000364511 [X] 1,2,4,8 * the whole document * [A] 3,5,6 | by applicant | GB2259172 | WO9406106 | US5629868 | DE19605132 | - ARMONK, IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (199304), vol. 36, no. 4 |