EP1065523 - Radiation image read-out method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa HealthCare Antwerpsestraat 195 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states Agfa HealthCare NV Antwerpsestraat 195 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Struye, Luc c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Corporate IP Department 3800 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Leblans, Paul c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Corporate IP Department 3800 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Theunis, Patrick, et al Agfa-Gevaert N.V. HE / Intellectual Property 3802 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Theunis, Patrick, et al Agfa-Gevaert N.V. HE / Intellectual Property 3802 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Application number, filing date | 00202109.5 | 13.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | US19990142276P | 02.07.1999 Original published format: US 142276 P | US19990159004P | 08.10.1999 Original published format: US 159004 P | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1065523 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1065523 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/29 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
G21K4/00 (EP,US);
A61B6/4216 (EP,US);
A61B6/502 (EP,US);
C09K11/7733 (EP,US);
G01N23/04 (EP,US);
G01T1/2012 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/50] |
Former [2001/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Auslesen von Strahlungsbildern | [2001/01] | English: | Radiation image read-out method and apparatus | [2001/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la reproduction d'images de rayonnement | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/50] | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4507562 (GASIOT JEAN [FR], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 2, line 28 - line 48 * * column 3, line 26 - line 31 * * column 4, line 18 - line 28 * * column 4, line 66 - line 68 * * column 5, line 37 - line 40 * * figure 1 *; | [YD]US5028509 (SHIMADA FUMIO [JP], et al) [YD] 1-7 * column 4, line 14 - line 23 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 22 * * column 10, line 25 - column 11, line 13; table 1 * * column 11, line 29 - line 33 * * column 11, line 47 - line 51 * * column 13, line 41 - line 46 * |