EP1080739 - Liquid venting surgical system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/10] | Liquid venting surgical system and cassette | ||
[2003/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bösch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Alcon, Inc Bosch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Alcon, Inc Bösch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Alcon Universal, Ltd. Bosch 69, P.O. Box 62 6331 Hünenberg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morgan, Michael D. 2665 Club Mesa Costa Mesa, CA 92627 / US | 02 /
Sorensen, Gary P. 24932 Calle Vecinidad Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley, 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2001/12] | Hanna, Peter William Derek Peter Hanna Associates 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2001/10] | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 00202150.9 | 20.06.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | US19990387357 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: US 387357 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1080739 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1080739 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1080739 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
A61M1/742 (EP,US);
A61M1/74 (EP,US);
A61M1/72 (EP);
A61M2205/123 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3337 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | Chirurgisches System mit Flüssigkeitsrücklauf | [2003/42] | English: | Liquid venting surgical system | [2003/42] | French: | Système chirurgical avec évent à fluide | [2003/42] |
Former [2001/10] | System zur Entfernung von Flüssigkeiten für chirurgische Eingriffe und Kassette | ||
Former [2001/10] | Liquid venting surgical system and cassette | ||
Former [2001/10] | Système chirurgical avec évent à fluide et cassette | Examination procedure | 05.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 05.10.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 31.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.03.2004 | [2007/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2371202 (ANVAR [FR]) [A] 1-4 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 25; figure 1 *; | [AD]WO9315777 (ALCON SURGICAL INC [US], et al); | [A]WO9533503 (SYNTEC INC [US]); | [X]WO9818507 (LITTLE INC A [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 7, line 5 - page 9, line 25; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US3589363 | US4223676 | US4246902 | US4493694 | US4515583 | US4589415 | US4609368 | US4869715 |