EP1055955 - Optical element suitable for projection display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yajima, Akitaka, c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392 / JP | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Jeffrey, Philip Michael, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00202160.8 | 23.07.1997 | [2000/48] | Priority number, date | JP19960215377 | 25.07.1996 Original published format: JP 21537796 | JP19960215378 | 25.07.1996 Original published format: JP 21537896 | JP19960355210 | 19.12.1996 Original published format: JP 35521096 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1055955 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1055955 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1055955 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/28, G02B5/30, G02B3/00 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
H04N9/3105 (EP,US);
G02F1/015 (KR);
G02B27/283 (EP,US);
G02B27/285 (EP,US);
H04N9/3167 (EP,US);
H04N5/7441 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/48] | G02B27/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/48] | Title | German: | Optisches Element für Projektionsanzeigevorrichtung | [2000/48] | English: | Optical element suitable for projection display apparatus | [2000/48] | French: | Elément optique pour dispositif d'affichage par projection | [2000/48] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 20.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97305527.0 / EP0821258 | Divisional application(s) | EP02010138.2 / EP1231498 | EP02010139.0 / EP1231499 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Request for further processing for: | 07.05.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2748659 (WALTER GEFFCKEN, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-11 * column 3, line 36 - column 6, line 16; figures 2,3,5 * [A] 3,6,7; | [XA]DE935663 (JENAER GLASWERK SCHOTT & GEN) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-11 * page 4, line 71 - page 5, line 102; figures 10-18 * [A] 3,6,7; | [A]US5096520 (FARIS SADES M [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 17 - line 66; figure 2 *; | [A]JPH07294906 ; | [A]EP0508413 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 9, line 19 - column 15, line 11; figures 6,8,10,12 *; | [A]JPH0682623 ; | [A]EP0359658 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 5, line 1 - line 12 * * column 15, line 16 - line 50 * * column 16, line 36 - column 17, line 5; figures 1-4,11,12; examples 5,7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07294906 A 19951110 (NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940623), vol. 018, no. 333, Database accession no. (P - 1759), & JP06082623 A 19940325 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |