EP1066752 - Air washer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laka Milieu B.V. Noordermorssingel 7 7461 JP Rijssen / NL | [2006/19] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states J.A. Niemeijer B.V. Prins Hendrikstraat 12 7591 DB Denekamp / NL | ||
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states J.A. Niemeijer B.V. Prins Hendrikstraat 12 7591 DB Denekamp / NL | ||
For all designated states Niemeijer, Gerardus Johannes Timotheus Westeinde 430 7671 ZG Vriezenveen / NL | |||
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states Niemeijer, Johannes Antonius Prins Hendrikstraat 12 7591 DB Denekamp / NL | ||
For all designated states Niemeijer, Gerardus Johannes Timotheus Westeinde 430 7671 ZG Vriezenveen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niemeijer, Johannes Antonius Deceased Deceased / NL | 02 /
Niemeijer, Gerardus Johannes Timotheus Deceased Deceased / NL | [2006/19] |
Former [2001/02] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Application number, filing date | 00202311.7 | 03.07.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | NL19991012530 | 07.07.1999 Original published format: NL 1012530 | [2001/02] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066752 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1066752 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/00, B01D53/84, B01D47/14, C02F3/10 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
A01K1/0047 (EP);
B01D47/14 (EP);
B01D53/14 (EP);
B01D53/84 (EP);
C02F3/101 (EP);
B01J2219/32279 (EP);
C02F2101/16 (EP);
C02F2103/18 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/02] | Title | German: | Luftwäscher | [2001/02] | English: | Air washer | [2001/02] | French: | Laveur d'air | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.06.2007 | CH | 20.06.2007 | CY | 20.06.2007 | DK | 20.06.2007 | FI | 20.06.2007 | IT | 20.06.2007 | LI | 20.06.2007 | IE | 03.07.2007 | LU | 03.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | GB | 20.09.2007 | SE | 20.09.2007 | GR | 21.09.2007 | ES | 01.10.2007 | PT | 20.11.2007 | FR | 22.02.2008 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
CY | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
FI | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 03.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
GB | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
FI | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 03.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
GB | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 03.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
GB | 20.09.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
IE | 03.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
IT | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 20.06.2007 | |
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0328758 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 1 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 5 * * column 6, line 31 - column 7, line 12; figure 3 *; | [X]NL1000490C (A & J DE JAEGER N V [BE]) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 10-22 * * page 2, lines 5-20 * * page 4, lines 1-.19 * * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 2; figure 3 *; | [A]US5693383 (BASSE HARTWIG [DE], et al); | [A]WO9833580 (PARTEK PAROC OY AB [FI], et al) |