EP1071022 - Systems and methods for generating dataset result matrices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duckworth, Jianmei F. SmithKline Beecham Pharm., 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 02 /
Stodola, Robert K. SmithKline Beecham Pharm., 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Giddings, Peter John, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Giddings, Peter John, Dr., et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00202614.4 | 20.07.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | US19990145407P | 23.07.1999 Original published format: US 145407 P | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1071022 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1071022 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
G16B30/00 (EP);
G16B30/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Extension states | RO | 20.07.2000 | SI | 20.07.2000 | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zum Erstellen von Ergebnismatrizen aus Datensätzen | [2001/04] | English: | Systems and methods for generating dataset result matrices | [2001/04] | French: | Systèmes et procédés de génération de matrices de résultats à partir d'ensembles de données | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 09.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/06] | 14.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - LIU Y A, "Efficient Computation via Incremental Computation", (199807), URL: http://citeseer.ist.psu.edu/38479.html, (20051213), XP002358759 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - RAMALINGAM G ET AL, "A categorized bibliography on incremental computation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 20TH ACM SIGPLAN-SIGACT SYMPOSIUM ON PRINCIPLES OF PROGRAMMING LANGUAGES, ISBN 0-89791-560-7, (1993), pages 502 - 510, URL: http://portal.acm.org/citation.cfm?id=158710, (20051213), XP002358760 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |