EP1079268 - A print having attached audio data storage and method of providing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Revocation of patent | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tutt, Lee W., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Spurr, Robert W., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Tehranchi, Babak, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Sanger, Kurt M., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 05 /
Tredwell, Timothy J., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/30] | Lee, Brenda, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2003/50] | Barker, Brenda, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2001/09] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00202718.3 | 31.07.2000 | [2001/09] | Priority number, date | US19990372442 | 11.08.1999 Original published format: US 372442 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1079268 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1079268 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G03B31/06, G03B17/24, G03B21/134, G03D15/00, G06K19/067 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
G03B31/06 (EP,US);
G03B2217/242 (EP,US);
G03B2217/246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/46] |
Former [2001/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Abzug und damit verbundener Audiodatenspeicher sowie Verfahren zu seiner Bereitstellung | [2001/09] | English: | A print having attached audio data storage and method of providing same | [2001/09] | French: | Tirage avec une mémoire pour des données audio attaché et procédé de réalisation | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 24.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.2003
28.08.2003
ADMISSIBLE Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE Opponent's representative Terrell, David Richard AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3800, Patent Administration, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.2003
28.08.2003
ADMISSIBLE Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE Opponent's representative Terrell, David Richard Agfa-Gevaert N.V., Corporate Intellectual Property, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [2003/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.2003
28.08.2003
ADMISSIBLE Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | 04.09.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.03.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.05.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.06.2009 | 25.05.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 03.09.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4905029 (KELLEY SCOTT A [US]) [AD] 1,4,8,10,13-16,19,22,23,25,29,30 * column 3, line 45 - column 7, line 50; figures 1-8 *; | [AD]US5521663 (NORRIS III WYAMN J [US]) [AD] 1,4-8,10,12,14-16,19-23,25-27,29,30 * column 9, line 63 - column 15, line 32; figures 4-13 *; | [AD]US5528222 (MOSKOWITZ PAUL A [US], et al) [AD] 1-3,8,9,16-18,23,24 * column 2, line 65 - column 7, line 39; figures 1-6,9-13 *; | [A]WO9840930 (PRECISION DYNAMICS CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,8,9,16-18,23,24* page 2, line 10 - page 10, line 5; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5878292 (BELL CYNTHIA S [US], et al) [A] 1,4-8,11-16,19-23,25-30 * column 5, line 21 - column 14, line 37; figures 1-10,13,58-74 * |