EP1043225 - Convertible seat/bed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reynard Aviation Limited Chatham Court, Lesbourne Road Reigate Surrey RH2 7LD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states Reynard Aviation Limited Chatham Court, Lesbourne Road Reigate, Surrey RH2 7LD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferry, David 6 Mayes Park House, Mayes Lane Warnham, West Sussex RH10 3SG / GB | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al FJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00202768.8 | 02.04.1998 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | GB19970006650 | 02.04.1997 Original published format: GB 9706650 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1043225 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Classification | IPC: | B64C11/06, B60N2/00 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
B64D11/0641 (EP,US);
A47C1/0352 (EP,US);
B60N2/02246 (EP,US);
B60N2/34 (EP,US);
B60N2/995 (EP,US);
B64D11/0604 (US);
B64D11/0638 (EP,US);
B64D11/06395 (EP,US);
B64D11/064 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Title | German: | In eine Liege veränderbarer Sitz | [2000/41] | English: | Convertible seat/bed | [2000/41] | French: | Siège transformable en couchette | [2000/41] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 04.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/22] | 16.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98302586.7 / EP0869061 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO9618537 | GB2334882 |