Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
13.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] |
21.02.2003 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] |
29.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
04.12.2002 | Change - extension states | |
15.11.2002 | Change - representative | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
13.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
30.08.2002 | Renewal fee | |
02.08.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
28.06.2002 | Change - applicant | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] |
28.06.2002 | Change - representative | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] |
21.06.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
08.02.2002 | First examination report | |
06.02.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
16.11.2001 | Publication of search report | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] |
10.08.2001 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] |
22.12.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.02.2001 [2001/06] |