EP1074730 - Center feed of air for assist fuel injector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Inc. 700 Park Avenue Chatham, Ontario N7M 5M7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Inc. 700 Park Avenue Chatham, Ontario N7M 5M7 / CA | ||
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states Siemens Canada limited 16 Industrial Park Road Tilbury, Ontario N0P 2L0 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dozier, Henry 4220 Brightwood Troy, MI 48098 / US | 02 /
Nally, Debora 2270 W. Island Road Williamsburg, VA 23185 / US | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Humphrey-Evans, Edward John, et al Siemens AG P.O. Box 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Humphrey-Evans, Edward John, et al c/o Siemens AG P.O. Box 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/33] | Allen, Derek, et al Siemens AG P.O. Box 22 16 34 80506 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2001/06] | Allen, Derek, et al Siemens Shared Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00202772.0 | 04.08.2000 | [2001/06] | Priority number, date | US19990369471 | 06.08.1999 Original published format: US 369471 | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1074730 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1074730 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1074730 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02M35/104, F02M69/08, F02M69/46 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
F02M35/10222 (EP,US);
F02M35/10039 (EP,US);
F02M35/10216 (EP,US);
F02M35/104 (EP,US);
F02M69/047 (EP,US);
F02M69/08 (EP,US);
F02M69/46 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/38] |
Former [2001/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zentrale Luftzufuhr für luftunterstütztes Brennstoffeinspritzventil | [2001/06] | English: | Center feed of air for assist fuel injector | [2001/06] | French: | Alimentation centrale en air pour injecteur à commande pneumatique | [2001/06] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.04.2003 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3788287 (FALEN W, et al) [X] 1 * figure 3 *; | [X]GB2203487 (FORD MOTOR CO) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [XA]US5209191 (KOPEC EDUARD [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 3 * [A] 8,14; | [A]FR2704601 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,8,14* abstract * |