EP1079414 - Color display panel with color filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2002/40] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2001/09] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Opitz, Joachim, Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Gruhike, Stefan, Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Gläser, Harald, Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | 04 /
Bechtel, Helmut, Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00202911.4 | 16.08.2000 | [2001/09] | Priority number, date | DE1999140195 | 25.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19940195 | [2001/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1079414 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1079414 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/89 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
H01J29/898 (EP);
H04N9/31 (KR);
H01J2211/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/08] |
Former [2001/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Farbbildschirm mit Farbfilter | [2001/09] | English: | Color display panel with color filter | [2001/09] | French: | Panneau d'affichage à couleurs avec filtre couleur | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 27.10.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0720201 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *; | [PA]JPH11233018 | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11233018 A 19990827 (TOSHIBA CORP) [PA] 1 * abstract * |