EP1186618 - Controlled rheology polypropylene heterophasic copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATOFINA Research Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [2002/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vandeurzen, Philippe Olmenlaan, 41 1750 Lennik / BE | 02 /
Albe, Lisa K. 5815 Reamer Houston, Texas 77074 / US | [2002/11] | Application number, filing date | 00203099.7 | 08.09.2000 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1186618 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/50 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
C08J11/22 (EP,US);
C08F8/50 (EP,US);
C08K5/14 (EP,US);
C08F2800/20 (EP,US);
C08F2810/10 (EP,US);
C08J2323/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/50, C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/14, C08L23/14 (US,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/49] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Heterophasische Propylenpolymere mit kontrollierten rheologischen Werten | [2002/11] | English: | Controlled rheology polypropylene heterophasic copolymers | [2002/11] | French: | Polymères hétérophasiques de propylène à rhéologie réglable | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 14.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.10.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.10.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4707524 (EHRIG RAYMOND J [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO9603444 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [DX] 1-18 * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 6 * * page 8, line 26 - page 10, line 5; claims 1-10 *; | [Y]WO9603397 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-18 * page 12, line 11 - line 13; claims 1-9 *; | [DY]WO9620247 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [DY] 1-18* claims 1-11 *; | [X]WO0023434 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 23 * * page 8, line 20 - line 27; claims 1-9 * |