EP1086991 - Thermoplastic elastomeric resin composition and a granule thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riken Technos Corporation 11-5, Nihonbashi Hon-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Riken Technos Corporation 11-5, Nihonbashi Hon-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Riken Vinyl Industry Co., Ltd. 11-5, Nihonbashi Hon-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tasaka, Michihisa, Riken Technos Corporation 11-5, Nihonbashi-Honcho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | 02 /
Yamanaka, Toshimi, Riken Technos Corporation 11-5, Nihonbashi-Honcho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | [2004/31] |
Former [2001/13] | 01 /
Tasaka, Michihisa, Riken Vinyl Ind. Co., Ltd. 11-5, Nihonbashi-Honcho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | ||
02 /
Yamanaka, Toshimi, Riken Vinyl Ind. Co., Ltd. 11-5, Nihonbashi-Honcho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00203334.8 | 25.09.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | JP19990270773 | 24.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27077399 | JP19990270781 | 24.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27078199 | JP19990270782 | 24.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27078299 | JP20000025478 | 02.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000025478 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086991 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086991 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08L53/02, C08L67/00, C08L77/00, C08L75/04, C08F287/00, C09D5/03 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
C08L75/04 (EP,US);
C08F287/00 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L53/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L67/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L75/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/51] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Elastomerharzzusammensetzung und Granulate davon | [2001/13] | English: | Thermoplastic elastomeric resin composition and a granule thereof | [2001/13] | French: | Composition de résine élastomère thermoplastique et granulés obtenus à partir de celle-ci | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 29.09.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 30.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH069884 ; | [A]US4743651 (SHIBUYA NOBUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,18 *; | [A]WO9003418 (TONEN SEKIYUKAGAKU KK [US]) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5317059 (CHUNDURY DEENADAYALU [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5929165 (TASAKA MICHIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 07, Database accession no. 1994-054049, XP002157553 & JPH069884 A 19940118 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |