EP1088539 - Raising device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FALCON B.V. Industrieweg 27 9672 AP Winschoten / NL | [2007/09] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Careflex Holding B.V. Radonweg 2 3812 RL Amersfoort / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meeuwissen, Martinus Adriaan De Savornin Lohmanlaan 2 6823 BG Arnhem / NL | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2001/14] | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00203391.8 | 29.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | NL19991013174 | 29.09.1999 Original published format: NL 1013174 | [2001/14] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1088539 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088539 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/10 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
A61G7/1017 (EP);
A61G7/1046 (EP);
A61G7/1051 (EP);
A61G7/1055 (EP);
A61G7/1061 (EP);
A61G7/1065 (EP);
A61G7/108 (EP);
A61G7/1096 (EP);
A61G2200/34 (EP);
A61G2200/36 (EP);
A61G2200/52 (EP);
A61G2203/44 (EP);
A61G7/1078 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2002/01] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hebevorrichtung | [2001/14] | English: | Raising device | [2001/14] | French: | Dispositif de levage | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 05.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE | 23.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.03.2003 | 30.09.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.02.2007 | FR | 28.02.2007 | DE | 30.05.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | BE | 28.02.2007 | |
DE | 30.05.2007 | ||
FR | 19.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BE | 28.02.2007 | |
DE | 30.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | BE | 28.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2680855 (ROBINSON MAUDIE L) [A] 9 * column 3, line 5 - line 20; figure 3 *; | [X]US4221011 (FLINCHBAUGH HENRY K) [X] 9,10 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9415570 (MAH GORDON B J [US]) [A] 9 * page 13, line 22 - page 14, line 9; figure 20 *; | [A]GB2292311 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]) [A] 1,3 * column 4, line 2 - line 6 * * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 12; figure - *; | [A]GB2293857 (ARJO LTD [GB]) [A] 1,5,7 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 22; figure - *; | [YD]DE4447393 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [YD] 1,3 * column 1, line 7 - line 28 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 14 * * column 3, line 30 - line 54; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2302561 (ARJO LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [YD]EP0782430 (CAREFLEX HOLDING BV [NL]) [YD] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29820207U (CAREFLEX HOLDING BV [NL]) [A] 11* page 8, line 6 - line 28; figures 5,6 * |