EP1096647 - Electric motor or generator including fluid cooled electronic components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2001/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thevenin, Marc J. 51A, rue de la Chapelle 6810 Prouvy / BE | 02 /
Pierron, Gabriel C. 13, rue du Klopp 57650 Fontoy / FR | 03 /
Kneppers, Gerard J. 9, route de Boevange 7762 Bissen / LU | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00203406.4 | 02.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | GB19990025395 | 28.10.1999 Original published format: GB 9925395 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1096647 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1096647 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/04, H02K9/19 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
H02K11/33 (EP);
H02K5/203 (EP,US);
H02K5/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/42] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrischer Motor oder Generator mit flüssigleitsgekühlten elektronischen Komponenten | [2001/18] | English: | Electric motor or generator including fluid cooled electronic components | [2001/18] | French: | Moteur ou générateur électrique avec des composants électroniques refroidis par fluide | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/24] | 07.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08336261 ; | [A]US4262224 (KOFINK WOLFGANG, et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 1A,1B *; | [Y]US4963778 (JENSEN NIELS D [DK], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 6, line 7 - line 17; figure 2 *; | [A]DE4444956 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE4442867 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19532976 (HUBER GERHARD DR ING [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 13 - line 18; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08336261 A 19961217 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |