EP1101708 - Food wrapping material for home use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuova Poliver di Oddone Colomba & C. S.n.c. Località Bessiche 43 15070 Tagliolo Monferrato (AL) / IT | [2001/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malaspina, Alberto Via Vela 10 15076 Ovada (AL) / IT | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Spandonari, Carlo Spandonari & Modiano s.r.l. Corso Duca degli Abruzzi 16 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Spandonari, Carlo, Dr. Ing. Spandonari & Modiano s.r.l. corso Duca degli Abruzzi 16 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00203864.4 | 06.11.2000 | [2001/21] | Priority number, date | IT1999TO00202U | 16.11.1999 Original published format: IT TO990202 U | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1101708 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/10, B65D75/26, B65D75/40 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
B65D65/10 (EP);
B65D75/26 (EP);
B65D75/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/08] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Für den Hausgebrauch bestimmte Verpackungsfolie für Nahrungsmittel | [2001/21] | English: | Food wrapping material for home use | [2001/21] | French: | Feuille d'emballage pour produits alimentaires destiné à l'usage domestique | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 20.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/03] | 16.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2775252 (PAPIERS A PAVIOT [FR]) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 36 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 25 - line 35 * * page 6, line 35 - page 7, line 9; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3193181 (PETER KONJEVICH, et al) |