EP1099369 - Vine pole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lankhorst Recycling B.V. Prinsengracht 2 8607 AD Sneek / NL | [2001/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flohr, Ernst Eduard Laurentius Antonius Singel 59 8601 AH Sneek / NL | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00203948.5 | 09.11.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | NL19991013540 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: NL 1013540 | [2001/20] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1099369 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01G17/14 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
A01G17/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/07] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Weinbergpfahl | [2001/20] | English: | Vine pole | [2001/20] | French: | Poteau de vigne | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/39] | 23.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.01.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.01.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1338991 (BOCCHI) [X] 1-6,8,9 * the whole document * [Y] 7,11; | [Y]FR2278247 (BEAUVAIS JEAN MARIE [FR]) [Y] 7 * page 2, line 5 - line 15; figures 1,2,7 *; | [Y]EP0945567 (VIDEOPLASTIC SPA [IT]) [Y] 11 * column 2, line 49 - line 54 * |