Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] |
17.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
17.04.2002 | Change - extension states | |
21.01.2002 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
21.01.2002 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
28.12.2001 | Definitive list of designations | published on 13.02.2002 [2002/07] |
30.03.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] |