14.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
19.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
15.10.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] |
24.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] |
17.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] |
13.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
25.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] |
07.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] |
23.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
24.10.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] |
11.09.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.09.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] |
09.05.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.03.2003 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
28.02.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] |
11.11.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.08.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
02.08.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
19.07.2002 |
First examination report |
|
13.07.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.04.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
08.03.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.04.2002 [2002/17] |
10.08.2001 |
Publication of search report |
published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] |
16.02.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] |