Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50004708D1 | 22.01.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE50004708 | 22.09.2000 | DE19948143 | 28.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001146109 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19948143 | 28.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1088733 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2003 | B1 | EP1088733 | 26.09.2001 | A3 | EP1088733 | 04.04.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19948143 | 28.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE256022T | 15.12.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19948143 | 28.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19948143 | 30.04.2003 | C2 | DE19948143 | 19.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19948143 | 28.09.1999 |