EP1109185 - High voltage circuit breaker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dienemann, Hold, Dr. Buexensteinallee 26 12527 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Knobloch, Harmut, Dr. An der Kappe 76 13583 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Lehmann, Volker Leipziger strasse 26 14929 Treuenbrietzen / DE | 04 /
Mascher, Karl am Dachsbau 102 A 13503 Berlin / DE | [2001/25] | Application number, filing date | 00250421.5 | 06.12.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | DE1999163256 | 17.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19963256 | [2001/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1109185 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1109185 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109185 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/02, H01H1/00, H01H11/00 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
H01H11/0062 (EP);
H01H33/02 (EP);
H01H2009/0083 (EP);
H01H2033/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/18] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hochspannungs-Leistungsschalter | [2001/25] | English: | High voltage circuit breaker | [2001/25] | French: | Disjoncteur haute tension | [2001/25] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 20.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 04.08.2004 | [2005/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE19622460 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1006537 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [PA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9636982 (COOPER IND INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |