EP1111566 - Method of transmitting transport data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Holding GmbH Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [2003/24] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Vodafone AG Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burk, Walter Büschemerstrasse 25 51427 Bergisch-Gladbach / DE | 02 /
Wassink, Volker Obermeidericher Strasse 18 47138 Duisburg / DE | 03 /
Reif, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Willicherstrasse 19 40670 Meerbusch / DE | 04 /
Büter, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Melaniestrasse 21 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
Heimann, Josef Mühlenbergweg 6 D-40629 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/26] | 01 /
Burk, Walter Büschemerstrasse 25 51427 Bergisch-Gladbach / DE | ||
02 /
Wassink, Volker Obermeidericher Strasse 18 47138 Duisburg / DE | |||
03 /
Reif, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Willicherstrasse 19 40670 Meerbusch / DE | |||
04 /
Büter, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Melaniestrasse 21 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 00250436.3 | 14.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | DE1999163547 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19963547 | [2001/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1111566 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1111566 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/123, G08G1/127 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
G08G1/202 (EP);
G08G1/127 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/26] | G08G1/127 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übermittlung von Transportdaten | [2001/26] | English: | Method of transmitting transport data | [2001/26] | French: | Procédé de transmission de données de transport | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 16.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 30.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0744727 (HIGHWAYMASTER COMM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,10-13 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 35 * * column 7, line 15 - column 7, line 23 * * column 8, line 23 - column 9, line 22 * * column 10, line 6 - column 10, line 21 * * figures 1,6 * [A] 3-9; | [XA]DE19755142 (KROENKE MATTHIAS [DE]) [X] 1,2,8-13 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 9 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 28 * * figure 1 * [A] 3-7; | [A]DE19810772 (SCHLINGELHOF [DE]) [A] 1,12 * column 2, line 27 - column 2, line 36 *; | [PX]DE19923167 (NEDLLOYD NTO GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-14 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 8 * * column 2, line 55 - column 2, line 62 * * column 3, line 11 - column 3, line 18 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 6 * * column 4, line 39 - column 4, line 47 * * column 4, line 52 - column 7, line 41; figures 1-8 *; | [PA]DE29910257U (ETMC WIESENGRUND GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-14 * abstract *; | EP1061494 [ ] (ETMC WIESENGRUND GMBH [DE]) |