EP1022464 - Compressor valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Kenji, c/o Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho, Isesaki-shi Gunma, 372-8502 / JP | 02 /
Ichikawa, Yoshinobu, c/o Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho, Isesaki-shi Gunma, 372-8502 / JP | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300057.7 | 06.01.2000 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | JP19990010483 | 19.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1048399 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1022464 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1022464 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/10 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
F04B39/1073 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/15] |
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verdichterventil | [2000/30] | English: | Compressor valve | [2000/30] | French: | Soupape de compresseur | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 01.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/09] | 17.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1336676 (HOERBIGER VENTILWERKE AG) [X] 1-4,7 * page 2, line 21 - line 125; figures 1,2,5,6; claim 9 *; | [A]US4749340 (IKEDA HAYATO [JP], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US4867650 (IKEDA HAYATO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 56 - column 8, line 20; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5603611 (TARUTANI TOMOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 31; figures 3-5 * |