EP1021010 - Methods of dynamically assigning channel codes of different lengths in wireless communication systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Tai-Ann 41 Redstone Drive Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US | 02 /
Kuo, Wen-Yi 107 Rolling Hill Drive Morganville, New Jersey 07751 / US | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2000/29] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300124.5 | 11.01.2000 | [2000/29] | Priority number, date | US19990115511P | 11.01.1999 Original published format: US 115511 P | US19990448808 | 24.11.1999 Original published format: US 448808 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1021010 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1021010 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
H04J13/18 (EP,US);
H04J13/16 (KR);
H04J13/0048 (EP,US);
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04W72/0466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur dynamischen Zuteilung von Kanalkodes verschiedener Länge in schnurlosen Kommunikationssystemen | [2009/05] | English: | Methods of dynamically assigning channel codes of different lengths in wireless communication systems | [2000/29] | French: | Procédés d'allocation dynamique de codes de différentes longueurs dans des systèmes de communication sans fil | [2000/29] |
Former [2000/29] | Verfahren zur dynamischen Zuteilung von Kanalkodes verschiedener Länge in schnurrlosen Kommukationssystemen | Examination procedure | 05.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 21.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 25.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5751761 (GILHOUSEN KLEIN S [US]) [X] 1-22 * column 10, line 48 - column 11, line 54 * * column 12, line 20 - line 40 * * figure 2 * |