EP1024091 - Removable tip dispensing closure and method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC. One SeaGate Toledo Ohio 43666 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC. One SeaGate Toledo Ohio 43666 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimble, Bradley J. 6718 Inglewood Road Holland, Ohio 43528 / US | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2000/31] | Votier, Sidney David CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300365.4 | 19.01.2000 | [2000/31] | Priority number, date | US19990236600 | 26.01.1999 Original published format: US 236600 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1024091 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/12, B29C45/16, B29C33/30 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
B29C45/16 (EP);
B65D47/121 (EP);
B29C2045/1601 (EP);
B29L2031/565 (EP);
B29L2031/712 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/16] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ausgabeverschluss mit entfernbarem Stopfen sowie Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2000/31] | English: | Removable tip dispensing closure and method of manufacture | [2000/31] | French: | Capsule de distribution équipée d'un bouchon ainsi que sou procédé de fabrication | [2000/31] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 11.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 09.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH481800 (NEOTIS S P A [IT]) [A] 9-12 * figures 4,5 *; | [X]EP0073356 (STAHLGRUBER GRUBER & CO OTTO [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * page 6, line 1 - line 34; figures 1-4; claims 1-3 *; | [A]JPH02205569 (FUJIMORI KOGYO CO, et al) [A] 1,2,5* figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE4000334 (FEMUK LABORTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 8,9 * figures 4-7 *; | [X]WO9807632 (OREAL [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10,13-15 * page 3, line 25 - page 7, line 20; figures 1-4 * |