Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1022054 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2003 | B1 | EP1022054 | 26.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9901105 | 20.01.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1022053 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2003 | B1 | EP1022053 | 26.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9901105 | 20.01.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE249878T | 15.10.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9901105 | 20.01.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE250973T | 15.10.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9901105 | 20.01.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60005228D1 | 23.10.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9901105 | 20.01.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60005572D1 | 06.11.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9901105 | 20.01.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9901105D0 | 10.03.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9901105 | 20.01.1999 |