EP1022053 - Mixer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S & W Process Engineering Limited S & W House, Long Hill Road March Cambridgeshire PE15 0BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states S & W Process Engineering Limited S & W House, Long Hill Road March, Cambridgeshire PE15 0BL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whyles, Graham Peter S & W House, Long Hill Road March, Cambridgeshire PE15 0BL / GB | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Tebbit, Antony Hugh Edward Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [2000/30] | Application number, filing date | 00300399.3 | 20.01.2000 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | GB19990001105 | 20.01.1999 Original published format: GB 9901105 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1022053 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022053 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01F15/00, B01F7/02 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
B01F27/091 (EP);
B01F27/23 (EP);
B01F27/82 (EP);
B01F27/61 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Title | German: | Mischer | [2000/30] | English: | Mixer | [2000/30] | French: | Mélangeur | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2002 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.10.2003 | BE | 01.10.2003 | CH | 01.10.2003 | CY | 01.10.2003 | ES | 01.10.2003 | FI | 01.10.2003 | FR | 01.10.2003 | IT | 01.10.2003 | LI | 01.10.2003 | NL | 01.10.2003 | DK | 01.01.2004 | GR | 01.01.2004 | SE | 01.01.2004 | DE | 03.01.2004 | LU | 20.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | PT | 01.03.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
BE | 01.10.2003 | ||
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
CY | 01.10.2003 | ||
ES | 01.10.2003 | ||
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
FR | 01.10.2003 | ||
IT | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
DE | 03.01.2004 | ||
LU | 20.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
BE | 01.10.2003 | ||
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
CY | 01.10.2003 | ||
ES | 01.10.2003 | ||
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
FR | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
DE | 03.01.2004 | ||
LU | 20.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
BE | 01.10.2003 | ||
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
FR | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
DE | 03.01.2004 | ||
LU | 20.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
BE | 01.10.2003 | ||
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
DE | 03.01.2004 | ||
LU | 20.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
BE | 01.10.2003 | ||
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
DE | 03.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
BE | 01.10.2003 | ||
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
DE | 03.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
DE | 03.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
FI | 01.10.2003 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 01.10.2003 | |
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 01.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3752057 (GROEN F) [AD] 1-3,5,7,8,11,12 * abstract *; | [A]FR2216011 (FRIGOMAT CIPELLETTI ALBERTO C [IT]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 2 - line 22; figure 4 *; | [AD]DE2815946 (BERENTS GMBH & CO KG A) [AD] 1,3,4 * figure - *; | [AD]EP0046477 (HAAGEN & RINAU [DE]) [AD] 1,3,7* abstract *; | [A]US4571091 (PARDO WARREN A [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5,7,12 * abstract *; | [A]GB2194460 (GUISTI & SON LTD T) [A] 1,3-8 * page 3, line 33 - line 40; figure - *; | [AD]US4818116 (PARDO WARREN A [US], et al) [AD] 1,3,5,7 * abstract *; | [A]EP0761296 (VAKUMIX RUEHR UND HOMOGENISIER [DE]) [A] 1,3-6 * abstract * |