EP1053864 - Multi-layer tubing assembly for fluid and vapour handling systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hybritech Polymers 2333 Whitehorse, Mercerville Road MPB-Suite 5 Mercerville New Jersey 08619 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states Hybritech Polymers 2333 Whitehorse, Mercerville Road MPB-Suite 5 Mercerville, New Jersey 08619 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsich, Henry S. 3579 Joshua Drive Rochester Hills, MI 48307 / US | 02 /
Su, Dean T. 12 Arnold Drive Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co. 39/41 South Drive Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B75 7TE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co. 1 Olton Bridge, 245 Warwick Road Solihull B92 9AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300441.3 | 21.01.2000 | [2000/47] | Priority number, date | US19990314810 | 19.05.1999 Original published format: US 314810 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1053864 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1053864 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B32B1/08, B29C47/00, F16L11/12 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
B32B1/08 (EP,US);
F16L11/04 (KR);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C48/335 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/18 (US);
B32B27/28 (EP,US);
B32B27/288 (US);
B32B27/304 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/322 (US);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
F16L11/12 (EP,US);
F16L11/127 (EP,US);
F16L9/121 (EP,US);
F16L9/123 (EP,US);
F16L9/125 (EP,US);
B29K2027/06 (EP,US);
B29K2027/18 (EP,US);
B29L2023/005 (EP,US);
B32B2327/18 (US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2377/00 (US);
B32B2597/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/32] |
Former [2000/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrschichtiger Schlauch für System zur Beförderung von Flüssigkeiten und Dämpfen | [2000/47] | English: | Multi-layer tubing assembly for fluid and vapour handling systems | [2000/47] | French: | Ensemble tube multicouche destiné à des systèmes de traitement de fluide et de vapeur | [2000/47] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 21.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9605965 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-26* page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 19 *; | [Y]WO9801694 (BUNDY CORP [US]) [Y] 1-26 * column W * * claim 7 *; | [A]US5743304 (MITCHELL FRANK L [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 25 *; | [A]WO9900455 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-26 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 6 *; | [A]US5865218 (NOONE DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 5 *; | [DY] - HSICH H S-Y, "MORPHOLOGY AND PROPERTY CONTROL VIA PHASE SEPARATION OR PHASE DISSOLUTION DURING CURE IN MULIPHASE SYSTEMS", ADVANCES IN POLYMER TECHNOLOGY, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, CHICHESTER, GB, (1991), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 0730-6679, pages 185 - 203, XP000645777 [DY] 1-26 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 33 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adv.1990.060100304 |