EP1022873 - Receiver for receiving both Digital Audio Broadcasts (DAB) as well as frequency modulated (FM) broadcasts comprising supplementary information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimoto, Masahi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300468.6 | 21.01.2000 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | JP19990014276 | 22.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1427699 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1022873 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
H04H20/22 (EP);
H04H20/65 (EP);
H04H60/40 (EP);
H04H60/43 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Empfänger für den Empfang vom digitalen Hörfunk sowie von frequenzmodulierten Rundfunkübertragungen, die Zusatzdaten enthalten | [2000/30] | English: | Receiver for receiving both Digital Audio Broadcasts (DAB) as well as frequency modulated (FM) broadcasts comprising supplementary information | [2000/30] | French: | Récepteur pour la réception de transmissions de radiodiffusion numérique ainsi que de transmissions de radiodiffusion en modulation de fréquence, comportant des données supplémentaires | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |