EP1022707 - Interactive allowance management application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BigChange Networks Inc. Suite 100, 1320 18th Street N.W. Washington, DC 20036 / US | [2000/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clausen, Mark W. 13212 Lantern Hollow Drive North Potomac Maryland 20878 / US | 02 /
Benton, Nina P. 2875 Woodland Drive,NW Washington D.C. 20008 / US | 03 /
Brestel, Eleanor P. 3717 Tustin Road Ellicott City Maryland 21043 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London, W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London, W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/30] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1M 1FD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300518.8 | 25.01.2000 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | US19990117037P | 25.01.1999 Original published format: US 117037 P | US19990118569P | 03.02.1999 Original published format: US 118569 P | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1022707 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1022707 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G06F15/02 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP);
G09B19/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/30] | G09B19/18, G09B7/04, G09B5/14, G06F17/30, G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Title | German: | Interaktives Anwendungsprogramm für die Taschengeldverwaltung | [2000/30] | English: | Interactive allowance management application | [2000/30] | French: | Programme d'application interactif pour la gestion de l'argent de poche | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 01.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2002 | 31.01.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0725376 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 6-9,11-20 * column 3, line 15 - column 7, line 45 * * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 29 * [Y] 6-12; | [X]WO9847090 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 3 *; | [X]WO9858334 (DOUBLECLICK INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 8, line 1 - page 8, line 15 *; | [X]US5855006 (HUEMOELLER MARK ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,19,20 * column 8, line 45 - column 12, line 11 *; | [Y]US5855008 (GOLDHABER A NATHANIEL [US], et al) [Y] 6-12* column 9, line 31 - column 14, line 62 * |