EP1120243 - A process for the production of a metal sheet having a fine composite structure and a metal sheet obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 1-1 Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states NIPPON METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 1-1 Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Masahiro, Nippon Metal Industry, Co. 1-30 Ohyama-machi Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Takeda, Seiichi, c/o Nippon Metal Industry, Co. 1-30 Ohyama-machi Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. Gray's Inn 14 South Square London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300542.8 | 26.01.2000 | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1120243 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1120243 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/01 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
B32B15/01 (EP,US);
B32B15/011 (EP,US);
B32B15/015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Metallbleches mit einer feinen Verbundstruktur, und hergestelltes Metallblech | [2001/31] | English: | A process for the production of a metal sheet having a fine composite structure and a metal sheet obtained thereby | [2001/31] | French: | Procédé de production d'une feuille métallique à structure composite fine et feuille métallique obtenue | [2001/31] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 18.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 03.11.2004 | FI | 03.11.2004 | LI | 03.11.2004 | NL | 03.11.2004 | CY | 26.01.2005 | IE | 26.01.2005 | LU | 26.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | DK | 03.02.2005 | GR | 03.02.2005 | PT | 03.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
CY | 26.01.2005 | ||
IE | 26.01.2005 | ||
LU | 26.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 26.01.2005 | ||
LU | 26.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 26.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 03.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH0440969 ; | [XA]US4839242 (MURAYAMA JUNICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,10 * claims 1-8 * * examples 1-10 * [A] 2-9; | [XA]EP0355046 (ALLEGHENY LUDLUM CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,10 * claims 1-10 * * figure 1 * [A] 2,4-9; | [XA]EP0596133 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,10 * claims 1-6 * * examples 1,2 * [A] 2,4-9; | [XA]EP0634794 (SUMITOMO SPEC METALS [JP]) [X] 1,10 * claims 1-13 * * figures 7,8 * * examples 1-3 * [A] 2-9; | [A]EP0672520 (CLAD LIZENZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-11 ** figures 1-9 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920520), vol. 016, no. 213, Database accession no. (C - 0942), & JP04040969 A 19920212 (TAKEFU TOKUSHIYU KOUZAI KK) [X] 1,2,4,5,10 * abstract * [A] 3,6-9 |