EP1026580 - Remote control of a desired function of an apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niida, Mitsuo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-Chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2000/32] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300573.3 | 26.01.2000 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | JP19990017745 | 26.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1774599 | JP20000014789 | 24.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000014789 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1026580 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1026580 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
G06F3/14 (EP,US);
G06F3/04897 (EP,US);
H04L12/40058 (EP,US);
H04L12/40117 (EP,US);
H04N23/632 (EP,US);
H04N23/661 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0606 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0626 (EP,US);
G09G2320/066 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/31] |
Former [2000/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fernsteuerung zum Regeln einer erwünschten Funktion eines Geräts | [2000/32] | English: | Remote control of a desired function of an apparatus | [2000/32] | French: | Système à télécommande pour commander une fonction désirée d'un appareil | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 19.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.06.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0748132 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-27 * abstract * * column 9, line 27 - line 39 * * column 10, line 38 - line 47 * * figures 1,30-80 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0812092 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-27 * abstract *; | [A]JPH10106142 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-27 * abstract *; | [A]EP0849884 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 19 * * column 2, line 12 - line 18 *; | US6233393 [ ] (YANAGIHARA NAOFUMI [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract ** claim 1 * |