EP1092568 - Tire air pressure monitoring apparatus and external communication apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pacific Industrial Co., Ltd. 100, Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states Pacific Industrial Co., Ltd. 100, Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | ||
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states Pacific Industrial Co., Ltd. 100, Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imao, Noboru c/o Pacific Ind. Co., Ltd., 100 Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | 02 /
Saheki, Setsuhiro c/o Pacific Ind. Co., Ltd., 100 Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | 03 /
Katou, Mitiya c/o Pacific Ind. Co., Ltd., 100 Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London, W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London, W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/16] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1M 1FD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300729.1 | 31.01.2000 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | JP19990290647 | 13.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29064799 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1092568 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1092568 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092568 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
B60C23/0408 (EP,US);
B60C23/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/05] |
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Luftdruckkontrolle von Reifen und externe Kommunikationsvorrichtung | [2001/16] | English: | Tire air pressure monitoring apparatus and external communication apparatus | [2001/16] | French: | Appareil de contrôle de la pression de l'air de pneumatiques et appareil de communication externe | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 09.11.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.03.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 02.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.12.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.12.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5573611 (KOCH RUSSELL W [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * column 7, line 31 - column 9, line 36; figures 2,4,5 * [A] 5; | [XA]US5602524 (MOCK MARKUS [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8 * column 6, line 8 - column 11, line 16; figures 1-3,5 *[A] 4,9,10 | Examination | WO9936850 |