EP1026695 - Inhibiting bias buildup in memories [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marconi Communications Limited New Century Park, P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Marconi Communications Limited New Century Park, P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orlowski, Pawel Andrzy Bronislaw 112 Westbourne Avenue Hull HU5 3HX / GB | 02 /
Williams, Martin John 11 The Esplanade New Ferry, Wirral, CH62 1EH / GB | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Tolfree, Roger Tolfree Patents and Trademarks Toll Drove Manea Cambridgeshire PE15 0JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Tolfree, Roger Keith Tolfree Patents and Trade Marks Toll Drove Manea, Cambridgeshire PE15 0JX / GB | ||
Former [2003/47] | Tolfree, Roger Keith Tolfree Patents & Trademarks, Rosemary Cottage Byall Fen Drove Manea, Cambs PE15 0JX / GB | ||
Former [2003/36] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/32] | Camp, Ronald Marconi Intellectual Property Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300935.4 | 07.02.2000 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | GB19990002560 | 05.02.1999 Original published format: GB 9902560 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1026695 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/24 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
G11C7/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | Verhindern von Bias-Aufbau in Speichern | [2000/32] | English: | Inhibiting bias buildup in memories | [2000/32] | French: | Inhibition du renforcement de la polaristion dans les mémoires | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 05.03.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3786437 (CROXON B, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0667621 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 22 * |